|
06/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 6030.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 6029.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 6029.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 7. Page 4965.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4881.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5113.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|