|
09/28/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 2913.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2325.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 9. Page 1263.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|