California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1865 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Amended

Bill August 21, 2018
Bill May 16, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018