09/17/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2018. | |||
09/17/2018 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/06/2018 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2018 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6807.). | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5648.). | ||
Senate | 08/08/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2018 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). | ||
Senate | 05/30/2018 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5245.) | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9). | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2018 | Read first time. To print. |