Assembly | 03/20/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2018 | Read first time. To print. |