|
09/01/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 183, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2174.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 1133.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|