California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1871 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2018

Amended

Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018
Bill March 14, 2018