Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2018 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |