Assembly | 04/24/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2018 | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |