|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 629, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3332.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2753.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2349.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1924.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|