California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1884 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 27, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018
Bill February 5, 2018