|
09/06/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6493.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5453.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5129.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|