|
09/26/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5457.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5129.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|