California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1895 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill March 15, 2018