|
09/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 860, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 6990.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 5966.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5371.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|