|
08/24/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 183, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6200.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4878.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4432.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|