California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1912 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill August 17, 2018
Bill July 3, 2018
Bill June 20, 2018
Bill May 9, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018
Bill March 19, 2018