Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2018 | Read first time. To print. |