California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1952 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2018

Amended

Bill June 26, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018
Bill March 19, 2018