|
08/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5166.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5129.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|