California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1957 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018
Bill April 9, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018
Bill March 14, 2018