|
09/10/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 314, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5702.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5524.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|