|
08/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 164, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6135.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5038.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4643.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|