Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Chu.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 5693.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Chu.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 30. Noes 26. Page 5432.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|