Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Read first time. To print. |