California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1985 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2018

Enrolled

Bill June 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill June 13, 2018

Amended

Bill April 30, 2018
Bill February 28, 2018