|
08/24/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5161.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 4890.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|