|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 963, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6888.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 5882.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 5242.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|