Senate | 08/16/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2018 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 4781.) | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 4). | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2018 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2018 | Read first time. To print. |