Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 3). | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2018 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2018 | Read first time. To print. |