Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 4825.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|