Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 4. Page 5602.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5435.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5434.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|