California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2026 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Amended

Bill August 13, 2018
Bill June 25, 2018
Bill June 6, 2018
Bill April 10, 2018