Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 19). | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2018 | Read first time. To print. |