California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2041 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2018

Amended

Bill June 18, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill March 22, 2018