Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 23). | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | Measure version as amended on March 19 corrected. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2018 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2018 | Read first time. To print. |