|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 941, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6608.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5552.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5035.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 4530.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|