Assembly | 05/23/2018 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2018 | Read first time. To print. |