Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 5401.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|