Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|