California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2055 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2018

Amended

Bill April 30, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018