Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 2. Page 4998.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|