California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2060 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Amended

Bill August 21, 2018
Bill June 28, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018