California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Amended

Bill June 27, 2018
Bill June 13, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018