Senate | 07/02/2018 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2018 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). | ||
Senate | 06/13/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and EQ. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5039.) | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2018 | Read first time. To print. |