|
09/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 814, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5517.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4644.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|