|
09/06/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 274, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6496.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5453.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5004.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|