California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2086 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/24/2018

                    Enrolled  August 24, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 20, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  August 14, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 03, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2086Introduced by Assembly Member Gallagher(Coauthors: Assembly Members Gipson and Mathis)February 07, 2018 An act to add Section 11165.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2086, Gallagher. Controlled substances: CURES database.Existing law classifies certain controlled substances into designated schedules. Existing law requires the Department of Justice to maintain the Controlled Substance Utilization Review and Evaluation System (CURES) for the electronic monitoring of the prescribing and dispensing of Schedule II, Schedule III, and Schedule IV controlled substances by a health care practitioner authorized to prescribe, order, administer, furnish, or dispense a Schedule II, Schedule III, or Schedule IV controlled substance.This bill would allow prescribers to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 11165.6 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:11165.6. A prescriber shall be allowed to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.

 Enrolled  August 24, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 20, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  August 14, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 03, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2086Introduced by Assembly Member Gallagher(Coauthors: Assembly Members Gipson and Mathis)February 07, 2018 An act to add Section 11165.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2086, Gallagher. Controlled substances: CURES database.Existing law classifies certain controlled substances into designated schedules. Existing law requires the Department of Justice to maintain the Controlled Substance Utilization Review and Evaluation System (CURES) for the electronic monitoring of the prescribing and dispensing of Schedule II, Schedule III, and Schedule IV controlled substances by a health care practitioner authorized to prescribe, order, administer, furnish, or dispense a Schedule II, Schedule III, or Schedule IV controlled substance.This bill would allow prescribers to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 24, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 20, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  August 14, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 03, 2018

Enrolled  August 24, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  August 20, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2018
Amended IN  Senate  August 14, 2018
Amended IN  Assembly  April 03, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 2086

Introduced by Assembly Member Gallagher(Coauthors: Assembly Members Gipson and Mathis)February 07, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Gallagher(Coauthors: Assembly Members Gipson and Mathis)
February 07, 2018

 An act to add Section 11165.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 2086, Gallagher. Controlled substances: CURES database.

Existing law classifies certain controlled substances into designated schedules. Existing law requires the Department of Justice to maintain the Controlled Substance Utilization Review and Evaluation System (CURES) for the electronic monitoring of the prescribing and dispensing of Schedule II, Schedule III, and Schedule IV controlled substances by a health care practitioner authorized to prescribe, order, administer, furnish, or dispense a Schedule II, Schedule III, or Schedule IV controlled substance.This bill would allow prescribers to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.

Existing law classifies certain controlled substances into designated schedules. Existing law requires the Department of Justice to maintain the Controlled Substance Utilization Review and Evaluation System (CURES) for the electronic monitoring of the prescribing and dispensing of Schedule II, Schedule III, and Schedule IV controlled substances by a health care practitioner authorized to prescribe, order, administer, furnish, or dispense a Schedule II, Schedule III, or Schedule IV controlled substance.

This bill would allow prescribers to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 11165.6 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:11165.6. A prescriber shall be allowed to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 11165.6 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:11165.6. A prescriber shall be allowed to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.

SECTION 1. Section 11165.6 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

11165.6. A prescriber shall be allowed to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.

11165.6. A prescriber shall be allowed to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.

11165.6. A prescriber shall be allowed to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.



11165.6. A prescriber shall be allowed to access the CURES database for a list of patients for whom that prescriber is listed as a prescriber in the CURES database.