08/27/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2018. | |||
08/27/2018 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/14/2018 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/09/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 5238.). | ||
Senate | 06/14/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 12). | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 0. Page 4642.) | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2018 | Read first time. To print. |