Senate | 08/16/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2018 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 27. Page 5441.) | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2018 | Read first time. To print. |